EP1002435 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE INSERTION AND EXTRACTION OF TELEPHONE NUMBERS FROM A WIRELESS TEXT MESSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COAD, Michael, T. 13817 Goodman Street Overland Park, KS 66223 / US | 02 /
KENAGY, Jason, B. 7529 Herschel Avenue 2 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins &Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/21] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97940730.1 | 28.08.1997 | [2000/21] | WO1997US15370 | Priority number, date | US19960705467 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: US 705467 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9809463 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002435 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04M1/57, H04M1/00 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M1/27475 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M2250/68 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINFÄDELUNG UND GEWINNUNG VON TELEFONRUFNUMMERN IN SCHNURLOSEN TEXTNACHRICHTEN | [2000/21] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE INSERTION AND EXTRACTION OF TELEPHONE NUMBERS FROM A WIRELESS TEXT MESSAGE | [2000/21] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'INSERTION ET D'EXTRACTION DE NUMEROS DE TELEPHONE A PARTIR D'UN MESSAGE TEXTUEL TRANSMIS PAR TELEPHONIE SANS FIL | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4747122 (BHAGAT JAI P [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * column W *; | [Y]US4994797 (BREEDEN ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0458563 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9214329 (TELENOKIA OY [FI]) [A] 1,7,14,17,24* page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 30 * |