EP0946594 - ENTERIC NEURAL PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF WASHINGTON Seattle, WA 98195 / US | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENSINCK, John, W. 232 Dorffel Drive East Seattle, WA 98112 / US | 02 /
VOGEL, Robin, E. 9230 S.W. 192nd Street Vashon, WA 98070 / US | 03 /
LASCHANSKY, Ellen, C. 2229 11th Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | 04 /
FRANCIS, Bruce, H. 1660 Interlaken Place East Seattle, WA 98112 / US | 05 /
BASKIN, Denis, G. 6205 145th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 06 /
D'ALESSIO, David, A. 4607 Woodland Park Avenue North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 07 /
HOFFMAN, Ross, C. Apartment 302, 503 13th Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97940809.3 | 04.09.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997US15578 | Priority number, date | US19960025468P | 05.09.1996 Original published format: US 25468 P | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9809991 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0946594 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/655, C07K7/08, A61K38/31, A61K38/10 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP);
C07K14/655 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/40] | Extension states | AL | 19.03.1999 | LT | 19.03.1999 | LV | 19.03.1999 | RO | 19.03.1999 | SI | 19.03.1999 | Title | German: | Enterisches Neuralpeptid | [1999/40] | English: | ENTERIC NEURAL PEPTIDE | [1999/40] | French: | PEPTIDE NEURAL ENTERIQUE | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 30.03.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |