EP1012836 - DUAL DATA RECORDED COMPACT DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEA Manufacturing, Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states WEA Manufacturing, Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Wea Manufacturing Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MECCA, Charles 1108 Blakely Street Jessup, PA 18434 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Neugebauer, Jürgen, Dipl.Phys., et al Fleuchaus & Neugebauer GbR Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97940937.2 | 10.09.1997 | [2000/26] | WO1997US15911 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913466 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1012836 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1012836 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/013 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G11B7/24085 (EP);
G11B7/0037 (EP);
G11B7/24088 (EP);
G11B7/005 (EP);
G11B7/24 (EP);
G11B7/26 (EP);
G11B7/261 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | MIT ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN DATEN AUFGEZEICHNETE KOMPAKT-DISK | [2000/26] | English: | DUAL DATA RECORDED COMPACT DISC | [2000/26] | French: | DISQUE COMPACT ENREGISTRE A DONNEES DOUBLES | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 08.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2004 | BE | 14.07.2004 | CH | 14.07.2004 | FI | 14.07.2004 | FR | 14.07.2004 | IT | 14.07.2004 | LI | 14.07.2004 | IE | 10.09.2004 | LU | 10.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | DK | 14.10.2004 | GR | 14.10.2004 | SE | 14.10.2004 | ES | 25.10.2004 | PT | 14.12.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
FR | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 10.09.2004 | ||
LU | 10.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
FR | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 10.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
IE | 10.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
BE | 14.07.2004 | ||
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
ES | 25.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
DK | 14.10.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
CH | 14.07.2004 | ||
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
LI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.10.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 14.07.2004 | |
FI | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 14.07.2004 | |
SE | 14.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 14.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS63257921 ; | [XA]JPS61123026 ; | [A]US5607188 (BAHNS TED L [US], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [XA]WO9725709 (CALIMETRICS INC [US], et al) [X] 7-10 * the whole document * [A] 1 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890220), vol. 013, no. 073, Database accession no. (P - 830), & JP63257921 A 19881025 (HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [X] 10 * abstract * [A] 1,4-6 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861023), vol. 010, no. 312, Database accession no. (P - 509), & JP61123026 A 19860610 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 10 * abstract * [A] 1,3 | International search | [A]US5453969 (PSALTIS DEMETRI [US], et al); | [A]US5471455 (JABR SALIM N [US]); | [X]US5559787 (NOMOTO TAKAYUKI [JP]); | [X]US5577016 (INAGAKI TATSUHIKO [JP], et al) |