EP0937293 - MARKER WITH LARGE BARKHAUSEN DISCONTINUITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2004/02] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 951 Yamato Road, P.O. Box 31 07 00 Boca Raton, FL 33431-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Wing, K. 9174 Chianti Court Boynton Beach, FL 33437 / US | 02 /
YAMASAKI, Jiro 1-32-204, Mishimazaki Higashiku, Fukuoka 813 / JP | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hafner, Dieter Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/34] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Ostendstrasse 132 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97940963.8 | 09.09.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US15950 | Priority number, date | US19960745683 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: US 745683 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820467 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937293 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937293 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14, G08B13/24, H01F1/03, H01F1/04 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G08B13/2437 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US);
H01F1/15391 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | SICHERUNGSETIKETT MIT HOHER BARKHAUSEN-DISKONTINUITÄT | [2004/29] | English: | MARKER WITH LARGE BARKHAUSEN DISCONTINUITY | [1999/34] | French: | INDICATEUR PRESENTANT UNE IMPORTANTE DISCONTINUITE DUE A L'EFFET DE BARKHAUSEN | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/34] | ETIKETT MIT HOHER BARKHAUSEN-DISKONTINUITÄT | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 10.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.03.2005 | [2007/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4607683 (HAMASHIMA TATSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4797658 (HUMPHREY FLOYD B [US]); | [Y]US5519379 (HO WING [US], et al) |