EP0865605 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR INSPECTING A SURFACE OF A GLASS MASTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/39] | GLASS MASTER SURFACE INSPECTOR | ||
[2003/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEA Manufacturing, Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states WEA Manufacturing, Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | ||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states Wea Manufacturing Inc. 1444 East Lackawanna Avenue, P.O. Box 321 Olyphant, PA 18447 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUHAN, John, M. 224 Second Street Blakely, PA 18447 / US | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Lewin, John Harvey Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97941167.5 | 05.09.1997 | [1998/39] | WO1997IB01232 | Priority number, date | US19960708671 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: US 708671 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810268 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865605 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865605 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N21/84, G01B11/30, G01N21/88, G11B7/00 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
G01N21/9506 (EP);
G01B11/30 (EP);
G01N21/958 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/39] | G01N21/00, G01N21/84, G01B11/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN EINER OBERFLÄCHE EINER RUNDEN GLASSCHEIBE | [2003/31] | English: | DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR INSPECTING A SURFACE OF A GLASS MASTER | [2003/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'INSPECTION D'UNE SURFACE D'UN DISQUE DE VERRE | [2003/31] |
Former [1998/39] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRUFEN DER OBERFLACHE EINER GLASSCHEIBE | ||
Former [1998/39] | GLASS MASTER SURFACE INSPECTOR | ||
Former [1998/39] | DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION DE LA SURFACE D'UN DISQUE DE VERRE | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 01.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.2004 | BE | 24.03.2004 | CH | 24.03.2004 | ES | 24.03.2004 | FI | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | LI | 24.03.2004 | NL | 24.03.2004 | DK | 24.06.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | PT | 24.08.2004 | LU | 05.09.2004 | IE | 06.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
ES | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
LU | 05.09.2004 | ||
IE | 06.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
IE | 06.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
IE | 06.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
BE | 24.03.2004 | ||
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
CH | 24.03.2004 | ||
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
LI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 24.03.2004 | |
FI | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4477890 (MOONEY DONALD G [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 4 - line 40 * * column 4, line 56 - line 65 * * column 5, line 11 - line 23 * * figures 1B,2 *; | [Y]US4954723 (TAKAHASHI IPPEI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 37 * * figures 5,8B,8C *; | [A]JPH07140089 (HITACHI ELECTR ENG) [A] 2-4* abstract * | International search | [Y]US4865445 (KURIYAMA KAZUMI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4954723 (TAKAHASHI IPPEI [JP], et al) |