EP0865140 - BATTERY CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IDE, Yuzo Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Koichi Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615 / JP | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97941243.4 | 24.09.1997 | [1998/38] | WO1997JP03420 | Priority number, date | JP19960256776 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25677696 | [1998/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813924 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865140 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/10, H01M10/44, H02J7/00 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
H02J7/0036 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/38] | H02J7/10, H01M10/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/38] | Title | German: | BATTERIELADEGERÄT | [1998/38] | English: | BATTERY CHARGER | [1998/38] | French: | CHARGEUR DE BATTERIES | [1998/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1998 | Translation filed | 26.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 26.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5477130 (HASHIMOTO HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column W *; | [A]US5291118 (KOJIMA MAKIO [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column W *; | [A]US4567421 (DATTILO DONALD P [US]) [A] 1,5 * column W * | International search | [A]US5481174 (MARTIN LARA J [US], et al); | [X]JPH06269132 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]EP0440756 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [X]JPH0311337U ; | [X]JPS5190433 |