EP0861996 - DEVICE FOR CONVERTING ROTARY MOTION INTO LINEAR MOTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS INC. 25-3, Minamiohi 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states HARMONIC DRIVE SYSTEMS INC. 25-3, Minamiohi 6-chome Shinagawaku, Tokyo 140 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Junji, Harmonic Drive Systems Inc. Hotaka-kojyo, 1856-1, Ohaza Maki Minamiazumi-gun, Nagano-ken 399-83 / JP | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97941263.2 | 29.09.1997 | [1998/36] | WO1997JP03453 | Priority number, date | JP19960258857 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25885796 | [1998/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814721 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861996 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/12 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
F16H25/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1998/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINER ROTIERENDEN BEWEGUNG IN EINE LINEARE BEWEGUNG | [1998/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONVERTING ROTARY MOTION INTO LINEAR MOTION | [1998/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION DE MOUVEMENT ROTATIF EN MOUVEMENT LINEAIRE | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1998 | Translation filed | 30.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 30.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/21] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1181881 (SCHOTTLER HENRY) [X] 1 * column 1, line 43 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-3B * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE1291590 (GAERTNER) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]US3659971 (SCHOTTLER HENRY) [X] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]US3653789 (MAROTH ARTHUR M.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS465660 ; | [X]JPH0791514 (ROPATEITSUKU BORISU BORISOBICH, et al) |