EP0939431 - CERIUM OXIDE ABRASIVE AND METHOD OF ABRADING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Masato 202 HitachiKaseiMatsushiro House, 3-4-3 Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 3055 / JP | 02 /
ASHIZAWA, Toranosuke 315-18, Tarazaki Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki-ken 312 / JP | 03 /
TERASAKI, Hiroki B207 Hitachi-Kasei-Shihoryo, 1-15-18, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | 04 /
KURATA, Yasushi 563-38, Higashioka Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305 / JP | 05 /
MATSUZAWA, Jun 104 HitachiKaseiMatsushiro House, 3-4-3 Matsushiro Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 3055 / JP | 06 /
TANNO, Kiyohito 2-27-14, Ishinazakacho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-12 / JP | 07 /
OOTUKI, Yuuto 1-4-8, Daiharacho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki-ken 316 / JP | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97941287.1 | 30.09.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997JP03490 | Priority number, date | JP19960258766 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25876696 | JP19960258767 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25876796 | JP19960258768 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25876896 | JP19960258770 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25877096 | JP19960258774 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25877496 | JP19960258775 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25877596 | JP19960258776 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25877696 | JP19960258781 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25878196 | JP19960259138 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25913896 | JP19970014371 | 28.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1437197 | JP19970112396 | 30.04.1997 Original published format: JP 11239697 | JP19970207866 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: JP 20786697 | [1999/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814987 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939431 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939431 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, H01L21/3105 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
C09K3/1463 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (KR);
C01F17/235 (EP,US);
C09G1/02 (EP,US);
C09K3/1409 (EP,US);
H01L21/02024 (EP,US);
H01L21/02065 (EP,US);
H01L21/31053 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/42] | H01L21/304, H01L21/321, B24B37/00, C09K3/14, H01L21/3105 | ||
Former IPC [1999/35] | H01L21/304, H01L21/321, B24B37/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/35] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMITTEL AUS CERIUM OXID UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHLEIFEN VON SUBSTRATEN | [1999/35] | English: | CERIUM OXIDE ABRASIVE AND METHOD OF ABRADING SUBSTRATES | [1999/35] | French: | ABRASIF A L'OXYDE DE CERIUM ET PROCEDE D'ABRASION DE SUBSTRATS | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1999 | Translation filed | 23.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 23.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05106514.2 / EP1610367 | EP07109339.7 / EP1833084 | EP09178160.9 / EP2164095 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.05.2009 | [2010/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2583034 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]) [X] 1-8,13,14 * page 4, line 31 - line 34 ** page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 5; table 1 *; | [EL]EP0820092 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [EL] 1-15 * abstract * * page 12, line 9 - line 11 * * page 12, line 9 - line 14 * * page 3, line 50 - line 54 * * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 4 * | International search | [A]JPH08134435 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) | by applicant | FR2583034 | JPH06330025 | EP0820092 |