Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0910396
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.07.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
28.03.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
11.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.10.2002 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.07.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
07.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.06.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] |
23.06.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
23.06.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
08.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.03.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] |
12.03.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |
12.03.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] |
05.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|