EP0910396 - ISOLATED, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES WHICH CODE FOR GAGE TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGEN, THE TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGEN, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 605 Third Avenue New York New York 10158 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 605 Third Avenue New York, New York 10158 / US | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states LUDWIG INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH 1345 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBACKER, Olivier Avenue Hippocrate 74, UCL 7459 B-1200 Brussels / BE | 02 /
VAN DEN EYNDE, Benoit Avenue Hippocrate 74, UCL 7459 B-1200 Brussels / BE | 03 /
BOON-FALLEUR, Thierry Avenue Hippocrate 74, UCL 7459 B-1200 Brussels / BE | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Harrison Goddard Foote Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1999/17] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 97941318.4 | 23.06.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997US10850 | Priority number, date | US19960669161 | 24.06.1996 Original published format: US 669161 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9749417 | Date: | 31.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/57] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910396 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, A61K38/00, A61K45/05, C07K7/00, C07K14/82, C12N15/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C07K7/00 (KR);
C12N5/10 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/17] | A61K38/00, A61K45/05, C07K7/00, C07K14/82, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE, DIE FÜR DAS GAGE-TUMOR-ABSTOSSUNGSANTIGEN KODIEREN, DAS TUMOR-ABSTOSSUNGSANTIGEN, UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [1999/17] | English: | ISOLATED, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES WHICH CODE FOR GAGE TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGEN, THE TUMOR REJECTION ANTIGEN, AND USES THEREOF | [1999/17] | French: | MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE ISOLEES CODANT POUR UN ANTIGENE GAGE DE REJET TUMORAL, ANTIGENE DE REJET TUMORAL ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Search fee paid | 10.12.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 15.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9601557 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]) [A] * example 9 *; | [X] - VAN DEN EYNDE, B. ET AL., "A new family of Genes coding for an antigen recognized by autologous cytolytic T lymphocytes on a human melanoma.", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (19950901), vol. 182, no. 3, pages 689 - 98, XP000914771 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.182.3.689 | International search | [Y]WO9503422 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US]) | [Y] - INTL. J. CANCER, 1989, Vol. 44, VAN DEN EYNDE B. et al., "Presence on a Human Melanoma of Multiple Antigens Recognized by Autologous CTL", pages 634-640. | [Y] - J. EXP. MED., September 1989, Vol. 170, WOLFEL T. et al., "Lysis of Human Melanoma Cells by Autologous Cytolytic T Cell Clones", pages 797-810. |