EP0873082 - ULTRASONIC ENERGY DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEART RHYTHM TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 26531 Ynez Road Temecula California 92591 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states HEART RHYTHM TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 26531 Ynez Road Temecula, California 92591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERMAN, Marshall, L. 875 Nolbey Street Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | 02 /
CASTELLANO, Thomas, M. 39960 Sweetbrier Crescent Temecula, CA 92591 / US | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97941463.8 | 09.09.1997 | [1998/44] | WO1997US15870 | Priority number, date | US19960708829 | 09.09.1996 Original published format: US 708829 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9811826 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0873082 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/22 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/2202 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00092 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/44] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLABGABEVORRICHTUNG UNF VERFAHREN | [1998/44] | English: | ULTRASONIC ENERGY DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [1998/44] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DELIVRANT UNE ENERGIE ULTRASONIQUE | [1998/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 04.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5295484 (MARCUS FRANK I [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,16 * column 3, line 39 - column 7, line 63; figures 8,9 *; | [Y]US5431664 (URECHE ALEXANDER [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5542916 (HIRSCH CHAYA [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * column 4, line 23 - column 6, line 16 *; | [A]US4808948 (PATEL DIPAKKUMAR I [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9601701 (UNIV IOWA STATE RES FOUND INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5447509 (MILLS TIMOTHY C [US], et al); | [A]US5484400 (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al); | [A]US5542916 (HIRSCH CHAYA [US], et al) |