EP1021688 - MULTIPLE ELECTROSTATIC GAS PHASE HEAT PUMP AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technical Limited 23545 N.W. Skyline Boulevard Hillsboro, OR 97124-9204 / US | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, Isaiah, Watas 23545 N.W. Skyline Boulevard Hillsboro, OR 97124-9204 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [2008/35] |
Former [2000/30] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 97941473.7 | 08.09.1997 | [2000/30] | WO1997US15898 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9913275 | Date: | 18.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1021688 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B21/00, H01J1/05, F28D15/00, F25B30/00, F28F13/16, H01L23/427 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
F25B21/00 (EP,US);
F28F13/16 (EP,US);
F25B2321/003 (EP,US);
F25B30/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y02B30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | F25B21/00, H01J1/05, F28D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGE ELEKTROSTATISCHE GASPHASENWÄRMEPUMPE UND VERFAHREN | [2000/30] | English: | MULTIPLE ELECTROSTATIC GAS PHASE HEAT PUMP AND METHOD | [2000/30] | French: | POMPE ELECTROSTATIQUE A CHALEUR A PHASE GAZEUSE MULTIPLE ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2000/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2000 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 18.07.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3515908 (CALDWELL FRENCH) [X] 25,28-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US3666005 (MOORE ROBERT DAVID JR) [A] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [A]US3682239 (ABU-ROMIA MOMTAZ M) [A] 1,9,17,33,41 * the whole document *; | [A]US4040478 (POGSON JOHN T, et al) [A] 17 * the whole document *; | [A]SU861916 (BURMISTROV VENIAMIN M [SU], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]SU1177648 (KISHINEVSK POLT INST [SU]) [A] 1-48 * the whole document *; | [A]US5180288 (RICHTER AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 1,9,17,33,41 * the whole document * * column 2, line 30 - line 35 * * column 6, line 18 - line 26 *; | [A]US5587880 (PHILLIPS RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - "ELECTRICITY SPEEDS BOILING AND CONDENSING", EUREKA (INC. ENGINEERING MATERIALS AND DESIGN),GB,FINDLAY PUBLICATIONS, HORTON KIRBY, KENT, (19920601), vol. 12, no. 6, ISSN 0261-2097, page 21, XP000275685 [A] 1-48 * page 21 * | International search | [A]US2510397 (HANSELL CLARENCE W); | [A]US3282267 (WILLIAM EIDUS); | [A]SU861916 (BURMISTROV VENIAMIN M [SU], et al); | [A]SU883644 (INST PRIKLADNOJ FIZ AN MSSR [SU]); | [A]US4396055 (MITCHELL JR ARCHER S); | [A]US4463798 (POGSON JOHN T [US], et al); | [A]SU1177648 (KISHINEVSK POLT INST [SU]); | [A]US4947648 (HARWELL ROBERT W [US], et al); | [AE]US5675972 (EDELSON JONATHAN SIDNEY [US]) | by applicant | US2510397 | US3282267 | SU861916 | SU883664 | US4396055 | US4463798 | US4947648 | US5040381 | JPH04251178 | US19970401038 |