EP0920618 - NEW KIND OF THIN FILMS FOR MICROSYSTEM TECHNOLOGY AND MICROSTRUCTURING AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clondiag Chip Technologies GmbH Löbstedter Strasse 105 07743 Jena / DE | [2005/50] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Clondiag Chip Technologies GmbH Löbstedter Strasse 105 07743 Jena / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Ermantraut, Eugen Mühlenstrasse 4 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERMANTRAUT, Eugen Mühlenstrasse 4 D-07745 Jena / DE | 02 /
KÖHLER, Johann, Michael Untergasse 8 D-07751 Golmsdorf / DE | 03 /
SCHULZ, Torsten Nollendorfer Strasse 11 D-07743 Jena / DE | 04 /
WOHLFART, Klaus Nr. 3 D-07751 Laasan / DE | 05 /
WÖLFL, Stefan Scheidlerstrasse 17 D-07745 Jena / DE | [1999/38] |
Former [1999/23] | 01 /
ERMANTRAUT, Eugen Mühlenstrasse 4 D-07745 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
KÖHLER, Johann, Michael Untergasse 8 D-07751 Golmsdorf / DE | |||
03 /
SCHULZ, Torsten Nollendorfer Strasse 11 D-07743 Jena / DE | |||
04 /
WOHLFART, Klaus Nr. 3 D-07751 Laasan / DE | |||
05 /
WÖLFL, Stefan Bahnhofstrasse 16 D-83059 Kolbermoor / DE | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/40] | Bock, Gerhard Patentanwälte Bock & Bieber GbR Winzerlaer Strasse 10 07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | Pfeiffer, Rolf-Gerd Patentanwaltsbüro Pfeiffer & Partner Helmholtzweg 4 07743 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 97941958.7 | 22.08.1997 | [1999/23] | WO1997EP04582 | Priority number, date | DE19961034120 | 23.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19634120 | DE19971005909 | 15.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705909 | [1999/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808086 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0920618 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0920618 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, C12G1/00 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
H01L21/02118 (EP,US);
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
C12Q1/002 (EP,US);
H01L21/312 (US);
B01J2219/00527 (EP,US);
H01L21/02282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1999/23] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE DÜNNSCHICHTEN FÜR DIE MIKROSYSTEMTECHNIK UND MIKROSTRUKTURIERUNG SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1999/23] | English: | NEW KIND OF THIN FILMS FOR MICROSYSTEM TECHNOLOGY AND MICROSTRUCTURING AND THEIR USE | [1999/23] | French: | NOUVEAUX TYPES DE FILMS MINCES POUR LA TECHNIQUE DES MICROSYSTEMES ET LA MICROSTRUCTURATION, ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1999/23] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.12.2005 | IE | 14.12.2005 | IT | 14.12.2005 | NL | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | ES | 25.03.2006 | LU | 22.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | IE | 14.12.2005 | |
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
LU | 22.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/08] | IE | 14.12.2005 | |
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | IE | 14.12.2005 | |
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | IE | 14.12.2005 | |
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | IE | 14.12.2005 | |
NL | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | NL | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | SE | 14.03.2006 | |
ES | 25.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 14.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS645489 ; | [A]EP0116361 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0246602 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DD298268 (ZENTRALINSTITUT F MOLEKULARBIO [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 07, Database accession no. 89-049890, XP002051423 & JPS645489 A 19890110 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0110483 | US5846814 | - MCCONNELL H.M. ET AL, "SUPPORTED PLANAR MEMBRANES IN STUDIES OF CELL-CELL RECOGNITION IN THE IMMUNE SYSTEM", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1986), vol. 864, pages 95 - 106 |