blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974272

EP0974272 - SWEETENER COMPOSITION IMPROVED IN TASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.09.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[2007/31]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Shoichi, Food R&D Lab. Ajinomoto Co. Inc.
1 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
02 / SHIMIZU, Tetsuji, Food R&D Lab. Ajinomoto Co. Inc.
1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Nash, David Allan
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Nash, David Allan
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97942214.401.10.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997JP03500
Priority number, dateJP1997005458210.03.1997         Original published format: JP 5458297
JP1997005458310.03.1997         Original published format: JP 5458397
[2000/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9839979
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974272
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974272
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:A23L1/236, A23L1/22, C07K5/06
[2001/37]
CPC:
A23L2/60 (EP,US); A23L27/30 (KR); A23L27/32 (EP,US);
C07K5/0613 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/04]A23L1/236, A23L1/22, C07K5/075
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:SÜSSSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTEM GESCHMACK[2000/04]
English:SWEETENER COMPOSITION IMPROVED IN TASTE[2000/04]
French:COMPOSITION D'ÉDULCORANT AU GOÛT AMÉLIORÉ[2007/04]
Former [2000/04]COMPOSITION D'EDULCORANT AU GO T AMELIORE
Entry into regional phase07.06.1999Translation filed 
28.06.1999National basic fee paid 
28.06.1999Search fee paid 
28.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
28.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
10.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2007Fee for grant paid
13.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07014890.3  / EP1852020
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.05.2008  21.05.2008  ADMISSIBLE
The Nutrasweet Company
222 Merchandise Mart Plaza, Suite 936
Chicago IL 60654-1001 / US
Opponent's representative
Hill, Justin John
Ipulse (IP) Ltd.
Carrington House
126-130 Regent Street
London W1B 5SE / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2010/29]
Opponent(s)01  01.05.2008  21.05.2008  ADMISSIBLE
The Nutrasweet Company
222 Merchandise Mart Plaza, Suite 936
Chicago IL 60654-1001 / US
Opponent's representative
Hill, Justin John
Ipulse (IP) Ltd. 9-10 Savile Row
GB-London W1S 3PF / GB
Former [2008/26]
Opponent(s)01  01.05.2008  21.05.2008  ADMISSIBLE
The Nutrasweet Company
222 Merchandise Mart Plaza, Suite 936
Chicago IL 60654-1 / US
Opponent's representative
Hill, Justin John
McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate
London EC2N 3AR / GB
05.06.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.05.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.06.2010
01.06.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.06.2010Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
CH01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
LI01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2008/28]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
SE01.11.2007
GR02.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/26]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
PT02.01.2008
Former [2008/23]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
DK01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
Former [2008/21]AT01.08.2007
BE01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
GR02.11.2007
Former [2008/14]AT01.08.2007
FI01.08.2007
Former [2008/12]FI01.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[YD]US4158068  (LUCK ERICH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-6 * page 1, lines 4-12 * * page 7, lines 31-35 * * page 10, lines 18-30; claim 3 *;
 [Y]WO9411391  (NOFRE CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 33; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]  - AYYA N ET AL, QUANTITATIVE AND QUALITATIVE EVALUATION OF HIGH-INTENSITY SWEETENERS AND SWEETENER MIXTURES, CHEMICAL SENSES,IRL PRESS, OXFORD,GB, VOL. 17, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 245-259, ISSN 0379-864X, XP000991203 [A] 1-6 * page 245, paragraph 1 * * page 251, paragraph 1 * * page 254, paragraph 1 *
International search[A]JPH0838099  (HOECHST AG);
 [X]JPH08503026  ;
 [A]JPH0951777  (AJINOMOTO KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.