blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0927116

EP0927116 - HYBRID GAS GENERATOR FOR AN AIR BAG WITH A MECHANICAL OPENING MECHANISM FOR THE STORAGE CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dynamit Nobel GmbH Explosivstoff- und Systemtechnik
Kaiserstrasse 1
53840 Troisdorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
Dynamit Nobel GmbH Explosivstoff- und Systemtechnik
Kaiserstrasse 1
53840 Troisdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ALBRECHT, Uwe
Borsigstrasse 5
D-90478 Nürnberg / DE
02 / BRETFELD, Anton
Kreuzsteinweg 28
D-90765 Fürth / DE
03 / KRAFT, Josef
Heinrichsburgerstrasse 33
D-92348 Berg / DE
04 / ZHANG, Jiang
Goerdelerstrasse 162
D-90439 Nürnberg / DE
[1999/33]
Former [1999/27]01 / ALBRECHT, Uwe
Borsigstrasse 5
D-90478 Nürnberg / DE
02 / BRETFELD, Anton
Kreuzsteinweg 28
D-90765 Fürth / DE
03 / KRAFT, Josef
Heinrichsburgerstrasse 33
D-92348 Berg / DE
04 / ZHANG, Jiang
Steinstrasse 24
D-90419 Nürnberg / DE
Representative(s)Scherzberg, Andreas Hans, et al
Chemetall GmbH
Patente, Marken & Lizenzen
Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Scherzberg, Andreas Hans, et al
Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3
60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1999/27]Scherzberg, Andreas, Dr., et al
c/o DYNAMIT NOBEL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Patentabteilung
53839 Troisdorf / DE
Application number, filing date97942947.918.09.1997
[1999/27]
WO1997EP05111
Priority number, dateDE199613883821.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19638838
[1999/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9812078
Date:26.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0927116
Date:07.07.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927116
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:B60R21/26
[1999/27]
CPC:
B60R21/272 (EP,US); B60R21/26 (KR); B60R21/20 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/27]
TitleGerman:HYBRIDGASGENERATOR FÜR EINEN AIRBAG MIT EINEM MECHANISCHEN ÖFFNUNGSMECHANISMUS FÜR DIE SPEICHERKAMMER[1999/27]
English:HYBRID GAS GENERATOR FOR AN AIR BAG WITH A MECHANICAL OPENING MECHANISM FOR THE STORAGE CHAMBER[1999/27]
French:GENERATEUR DE GAZ HYBRIDE POUR UN AIRBAG AVEC UN SYSTEME D'OUVERTURE MECANIQUE POUR LA CHAMBRE D'ACCUMULATION[1999/27]
Entry into regional phase21.04.1999National basic fee paid 
21.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/27]
22.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2001Fee for grant paid
30.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.12.2001
SE05.03.2002
[2008/08]
Former [2002/27]SE05.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2217186  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 34; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9311973  (BENDIX ATLANTIC INFLATOR CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 26 - page 17, line 10; figures 6-13 *;
 [DA]EP0616578  (BENDIX ATLANTIC INFLATOR CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.