EP0876620 - METHOD OF DETECTING AND LOCATING A HIGH-RESISTANCE EARTH FAULT IN AN ELECTRIC POWER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states ABB Transmit Oy P.O. Box 699 65101 Vaasa / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHTONEN, Matti Kuukausikuja 4 as 2 FIN-02200 Espoo / FI | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Lipsanen, Jari Seppo Einari Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Lipsanen, Jari Seppo Einari Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97942985.9 | 03.10.1997 | [1998/46] | WO1997FI00599 | Priority number, date | FI19960004431 | 04.11.1996 Original published format: FI 964431 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820356 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876620 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876620 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08, H02H3/16 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
G01R31/086 (EP);
H02H3/165 (EP);
H02H3/402 (EP);
Y04S10/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [1998/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ORTUNG VON HOCHOHMIGEN ERDSCHLÜSSEN IN EINEM STROMVERSORGUNGSNETZ | [1998/46] | English: | METHOD OF DETECTING AND LOCATING A HIGH-RESISTANCE EARTH FAULT IN AN ELECTRIC POWER NETWORK | [1998/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET DE LOCALISATION DE DEFAUT DE TERRE A RESISTANCE ELEVEE DANS UN RESEAU ELECTRIQUE | [2004/03] |
Former [1998/46] | PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET DE LOCALISATION DE DEFAUT A LA TERRE A RESISTANCE ELEVEE DANS UN RESEAU ELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2004 | BE | 09.06.2004 | IT | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | ES | 20.09.2004 | IE | 04.10.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 09.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4729052 (WINTER KLAUS [SE]); | [A]DE4140556 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US5390067 (ERIKSSON LEIF [SE], et al); | [A]WO9524014 (ABB POWER T & D CO [US]); | [A]US5515227 (ROBERTS JEFFREY B [US], et al) |