EP0929903 - ASSEMBLY FRAME FOR NUCLEAR FUEL WITH GUIDE TUBES AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Framatome ANP Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Framatome ANP Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES MATIERES NUCLEAIRES 2, rue Paul Dautier 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROSSET, Alain 275, rue des Fours F-69270 Fontaines-Saint-Martin / FR | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/29] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97943015.4 | 29.09.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997FR01708 | Priority number, date | FR19960011870 | 30.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9611870 | [1999/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814958 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929903 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929903 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/334 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
G21C3/334 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | SKELETT EINES KERNBRENNSTABBÜNDELS MIT FÜHRUNGSROHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR FERTIGUNG DERARTIGEN SKELETTS | [1999/29] | English: | ASSEMBLY FRAME FOR NUCLEAR FUEL WITH GUIDE TUBES AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [1999/29] | French: | SQUELETTE D'ASSEMBLAGE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE A TUBES GUIDES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL SQUELETTE | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4492668 (PILGRIM JR LAWRENCE G [US], et al) [A] 1-3,8 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 48; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4738820 (WILSON JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 2-5; claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0578848 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0268817 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6,8 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0201859 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |