Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0928336
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.04.2005 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
24.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.05.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |
28.05.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |
03.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|