EP0928336 - CHAPERONE FRAGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL 20 Park Crescent London W1N 4AL / GB | [1999/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERSHT, Alan R., MRC Unit for Prot. Func. Design dUniv. of Cambridge, LensfieldRoad Cambridge CB2 1EW / GB | 02 /
ZAHN, Ralph, MRC Unit for Protein Function Design University of Cambridge, Lensfield Road Cambridge CB2 1EW / GB | 03 /
ALTAMIRANO, Myriam Marlenne 302 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 2QG / GB | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97943058.4 | 26.09.1997 | [1999/28] | WO1997GB02652 | Priority number, date | GB19960020243 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9620243 | WO1996GB02980 | 03.12.1996 Original published format: PCT/GB96/02980 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813496 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928336 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C12N15/70, C12N1/21, C07K1/113, C07K14/245, C07K16/12, A61K38/16, // (C12N1/21, C12R1:19) | [1999/28] | CPC: |
C07K1/1133 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K14/245 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/28] | Title | German: | CHAPERON-FRAGMENTE | [1999/28] | English: | CHAPERONE FRAGMENTS | [1999/28] | French: | FRAGMENTS DE PROTEINE CHAPERON | [1999/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 23.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0650975 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-7,11,12,18,38-40 * example -; claim - *; | [DX] - Y. MAKINO ET AL., "Truncated GroEL monomer has the ability to promote folding of rhodanese without GroES and ATP", FEBS LETTERS, AMSTERDAM NL, (19931227), vol. 336, no. 2, pages 363 - 367, XP002037451 [DX] 1-7,11,12,38-40 * page 365, column R, paragraph 2 - page 366, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(93)80838-L | [A] - Z.W. WHITE ET AL., "A Monomeric Variant of GroEL Binds Nucleotides but Is Inactive as a Molecular Chaperone", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BALTIMORE, MD US, (19950901), vol. 270, no. 35, pages 20404 - 20409, XP002037452 [A] 2 * page 20407, column R, paragraph 2 - page 20409, column L, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.35.20404 | [DX] - H. TAGUCHI ET AL., "Monomeric Chaperonin-60 and Its 50-kDa Fragment Possess the Ability to Interact with Non-native Proteins, to Suppress Aggregation, and to Promote Protein Folding", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, BALTIMORE, MD US, (19940318), vol. 269, no. 11, pages 8529 - 8534, XP002037453 [DX] 1-7 * page 8533, column L, paragraph 2 - page 8534, column R, paragraph 1 * | [T] - R. ZAHN ET AL., "Chaperone activity and structure of monomeric polypeptide binding domains of GroEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (19961224), vol. 93, no. 26, pages 15024 - 15029, XP002037454 [T] 1-50 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.26.15024 |