Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0964687 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0964687



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(26)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 226
29.09.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.05.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
09.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
09.05.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.02.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.02.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
16.08.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
16.08.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.05.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.05.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
25.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.05.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.11.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.04.1999 Annex Search / examination 31
12.04.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
12.04.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.04.1999 Priority document Search / examination 28
12.04.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.04.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 40
20.05.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.03.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
19.03.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28
19.03.1998 Priority document Search / examination 28