EP0872810 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING STRIPE DEFECTS On PRINTED MATTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 162 / JP | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATOU, Hiroshi, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | 02 /
SAKATA, Hideto, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | 03 /
SOEDA, Masahiko, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Kenta, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd 1-1, Ichigayakaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97943155.8 | 08.10.1997 | [1998/43] | WO1997JP03611 | Priority number, date | JP19960268375 | 09.10.1996 Original published format: JP 26837596 | JP19960319230 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31923096 | JP19970212976 | 07.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21297697 | JP19970213211 | 07.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21321197 | JP19970213212 | 07.08.1997 Original published format: JP 21321297 | [1998/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815919 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872810 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T5/00, G06K9/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
B41F33/0036 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30144 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/43] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1998/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERKENNEN VON STREIFENDEFEKTEN IN DRUCKSACHEN | [1998/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING STRIPE DEFECTS On PRINTED MATTER | [1998/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE DEFAUTS DE RAIES SUR DES DOCUMENTS IMPRIMES | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1998 | Translation filed | 08.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH07175926 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPH03264359 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPS6319078 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH07234933 (NEC CORP) |