24.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
03.07.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.12.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
14.12.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
08.11.2007 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
03.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.08.2003 |
First examination report |
|
08.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.03.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] |
09.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.09.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
04.09.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] |
26.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.07.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|