Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1148457 | Global Dossier | 23.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21321297 | 07.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3902823B | Global Dossier | 11.04.2007 | B2 | JPH10157081 | 16.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP31923096 | 29.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3865880B | Global Dossier | 10.01.2007 | B2 | JPH1148456 | 23.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21297697 | 07.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3835898B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2006 | B2 | JPH1153557 | 26.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21321197 | 07.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3816994B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2006 | B2 | JPH10116344 | 06.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26837596 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0872810 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2000 | A4 | EP0872810 | 21.10.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21321197 | 07.08.1997 | JP21321297 | 07.08.1997 | JP9703611 | 08.10.1997 | JP31923096 | 29.11.1996 | JP21297697 | 07.08.1997 | JP26837596 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6366358 | 02.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP21321197 | 07.08.1997 | JP21321297 | 07.08.1997 | JP9703611 | 08.10.1997 | JP31923096 | 29.11.1996 | JP21297697 | 07.08.1997 | JP26837596 | 09.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9815919 | Global Dossier | 16.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21321197 | 07.08.1997 | JP21321297 | 07.08.1997 | JP31923096 | 29.11.1996 | JP21297697 | 07.08.1997 | JP26837596 | 09.10.1996 |