EP0955993 - TOPICAL COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING LIPID BARRIER SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-L Management Corp. 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 / US | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLE, Edward 140 Meyer Avenue Valley Stream, NY 11580 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Jon 15 Davenport Avenue, 4G New Rochelle, NY 10805 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 97943321.6 | 11.09.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US16364 | Priority number, date | US19960712988 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: US 712988 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810739 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955993 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955993 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/40, A61K7/48 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (KR);
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q17/00 (KR);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | A61K7/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | TOPISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER LIPIDBARRIERESYNTHESE | [1999/46] | English: | TOPICAL COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING LIPID BARRIER SYNTHESIS | [1999/46] | French: | COMPOSITION TOPIQUE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE POUR AMELIORER LA SYNTHESE DE LA BARRIERE LIPIDIQUE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 30.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | PT | 31.08.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | [2011/46] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4793990 (GROLLIER JEAN F [FR], et al) | Examination | RU1770352 | US4748258 | - "Toilet soap composition", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 45, Database accession no. 1993-358162, & SU1770352 A1 19921023 (AEROZOL SCI PRODN ASSOC; STALGENE AGRIC CO) |