EP0938721 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACTIVATING MAGNETOMECHANICAL EAS MARKERS WHILE PREVENTING FORMATION OF DEMAGNETIZATION FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [2004/02] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics Corporation 951 Yamato Road, P.O. Box 31 07 00 Boca Raton, FL 33431-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPELAND, Richard, L. 20777 Ramita Trail Boca Raton, FL 33433 / US | 02 /
LIAN, Ming, R. 22252 Collington Drive Boca Raton, FL 33428 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hafner, Dieter, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr., et al Hafner & Partner GbR Patent-/Rechtsanwälte Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Ostendstrasse 132 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97943324.0 | 12.09.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US16374 | Priority number, date | US19960745829 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: US 745829 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821700 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938721 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938721 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G08B13/2411 (EP,US);
G08B13/2434 (EP,US);
G08B13/2437 (EP,US);
G08B13/244 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/16] | G08B13/187, G08B13/24 | ||
Former IPC [1999/35] | G08B13/187 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKTIVIERUNG MAGNETOMECHANISCHER EAS-MARKIERUNGSELEMENTE OHNE ENTMAGNETISIERUNGSFELDERZEUGUNG | [2006/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ACTIVATING MAGNETOMECHANICAL EAS MARKERS WHILE PREVENTING FORMATION OF DEMAGNETIZATION FIELD | [1999/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SERVANT A ACTIVER DES MARQUEURS MAGNETOMECANIQUES D'UN SYSTEME ELECTRONIQUE DE SURVEILLANCE D'ARTICLES, TOUT EN EMPECHANT LA FORMATION DE CHAMP DE DEMAGNETISATION | [1999/35] |
Former [1999/35] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AKTIVIERUNG MAGNETOMECHANISCHER, ENTMAGNETISIERUNGSFELDERZEUGUNG VERHINDERNDER EAS-MARKIERUNGSELEMENTE | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4510489 (ANDERSON III PHILIP M [US], et al); | [A]US5469140 (LIU NEN-CHIN [US], et al); | [A]US5494550 (BENGE S EUGENE [US]); | [A]US5495230 (LIAN MING-REN [US]); | [A]US5602528 (WITCHGER WILLIAM J [US]) |