18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
01.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
23.02.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
16.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.10.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
06.10.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
06.10.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
29.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.05.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] |
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.11.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
14.11.2003 |
First examination report |
|
04.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.03.2002 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
02.03.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
03.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.07.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] |
16.07.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] |
26.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.11.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|