Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0869918 | Global Dossier | 12.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US28808894 | 10.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3877780B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2007 | B2 | JP2001503894 | 21.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0697683 | Global Dossier | 21.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28808894 | 10.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU733184B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2001 | B2 | AU4482097 | 03.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0938721 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2007 | B1 | EP0938721 | 17.04.2002 | A4 | EP0938721 | 01.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9503584 | 09.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US28808894 | 10.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9713347 | 09.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2148564 | 11.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28808894 | 10.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2271877 | 01.09.2009 | C | CA2271877 | 22.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2541740 | 22.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2271877 | 12.09.1997 | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69737530T | 19.07.2007 | T2 | DE69737530D1 | 10.05.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1024553 | 13.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | US9716374 | 12.09.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5949318 | 07.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US28808894 | 10.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6020817 | 01.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US28808894 | 10.08.1994 | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9821700 | Global Dossier | 22.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR010287 | 07.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74582996 | 12.11.1996 |