EP0932492 - MAGNETIC PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION Suite 450, 4450 New Linden Hill Road Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRONG, Michael, D. 5103 Lenker Street Mechanicsburg, PA 17055 / US | 02 /
YEOMANS, Michael, A. 3504 Countryside Lane Camp Hill, PA 17011 / US | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 97943361.2 | 18.09.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997US16569 | Priority number, date | US19960717373 | 20.09.1996 Original published format: US 717373 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812044 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932492 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B30B1/42 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
B30B1/42 (EP,US);
Y10S72/707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1999/31] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE PRESSE | [1999/31] | English: | MAGNETIC PRESS | [1999/31] | French: | PRESSE MAGNETIQUE | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 14.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/45] | 10.06.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US3783662 (KELLER J, et al) [YD] 1-11 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US2876452 (HERMAN WILLIAM P, et al) [Y] 1-4,6-8 * figures 1,2,5; claim 1 *; | [Y]FR2192908 (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]) [Y] 5 * figure 2 *; | [Y]JPS5986207 ; | [Y]JPS59124105 ; | [AD]US3584496 (KELLER JOSEPH RICHARD) [AD] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US5502996 (STRONG MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO8908936 (SCHUELE HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,3; claim 8 *; | [A]US2951437 (RUDOLF DIENER) [A] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5131124 (SKOTEK DAVID A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH04336402 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840911), vol. 008, no. 198, Database accession no. (E - 265), & JP59086207 A 19840518 (RICOH KK) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841113), vol. 008, no. 247, Database accession no. (E - 278), & JP59124105 A 19840718 (AMANO KK) [Y] 11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930413), vol. 017, no. 188, Database accession no. (E - 1349), & JP04336402 A 19921124 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 9,10 * abstract * |