EP0956031 - INHIBITION OF 26 S AND 20 S PROTEASOME BY INDANONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/46] | INHIBITION OF 26S AND 20S PROTEASOME BY INDANONES | ||
[2005/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CV THERAPEUTICS, INC. 3172 Porter Drive Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUM, Robert, T. 781 Barron Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
SCHOW, Steven, R. 204 Mendocino Way Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 03 /
JOLY, Alison 3205 Monterey Street San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | 04 /
KERWAR, Suresh 90 Edgewood Road Westchester, NY 10562 / US | 05 /
NELSON, Marek, G. 2690 Park Way Sunol, CA 94586 / US | 06 /
WICK, Michael, M. 16 Beresford Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02146 / US | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius, Volker ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Vossius, Volker, Dr. Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei - Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97943499.0 | 23.09.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997US17013 | Priority number, date | US19960719042 | 24.09.1996 Original published format: US 719042 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813061 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956031 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956031 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/04, A61K38/05, A61K31/12, A61P31/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
C07D295/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/12 (KR);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K38/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C233/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | A61K38/04, A61K38/05, A61K31/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Extension states | AL | 21.04.1999 | LT | 21.04.1999 | LV | 21.04.1999 | RO | 21.04.1999 | SI | 21.04.1999 | Title | German: | HEMMUNG DER 26 S SOWIE DER 20 S PROTEASOME DURCH INDANON-DERIVATE | [2005/04] | English: | INHIBITION OF 26 S AND 20 S PROTEASOME BY INDANONES | [2005/04] | French: | INHIBITION DE PROTEASOME 26 S ET 20 S AU MOYEN D'INDANONES | [2005/04] |
Former [1999/46] | VERWENDUNG VON PHENYLZYKLOPOPYLAMINE ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER BILDUNG VON TRÄNENFLUSSIGKEIT | ||
Former [1999/46] | INHIBITION OF 26S AND 20S PROTEASOME BY INDANONES | ||
Former [1999/46] | INHIBITION DE PROTEASOME 26S ET 20S AU MOYEN D'INDANONES | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2005 | BE | 15.06.2005 | CH | 15.06.2005 | FI | 15.06.2005 | LI | 15.06.2005 | NL | 15.06.2005 | DK | 15.09.2005 | GR | 15.09.2005 | SE | 15.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | PT | 23.11.2005 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/30] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
DK | 15.09.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
NL | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
CH | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
LI | 15.06.2005 | ||
GR | 15.09.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
PT | 23.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.06.2005 | |
BE | 15.06.2005 | ||
FI | 15.06.2005 | ||
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 15.06.2005 | |
SE | 15.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 15.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9200961 (PFIZER [US]) [A] 1-37 *cf. abstract, page 1, "background of the invention", claims*; | [A]US5409944 (BLACK W CAMERON [CA], et al) [A] 1-37 * cf. abstract, col. 5, lines 47-51*; | [A]WO9524914 (MYOGENICS INC [US]) [A] 1-37*cf. abstract*; | [A]US5457237 (DOW ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-37 *cf. abstract, and col. 1 bridging with col. 2, lines 1-55, col. 11, first para.* |