EP0976205 - DATA TRANSFER METHOD AND SYSTEM IN LOW VOLTAGE NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brandt, Frank Geraer Strasse 10 A 12209 Berlin / DE | [2002/31] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Brandt, Frank Geraer Strasse 10 A 12209 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Lukanek, Frank Fachinger Strasse 48 A 13591 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states Berliner Kraft- und Licht (Bewag)-Aktiengesellschaft Puschkinallee 52sse 26 12435 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDT, Frank Geraer Strasse 10A D-12209 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LUKANEK, Frank Brombeerweg 32 D-14052 Berlin / DE | 03 /
HENSEN, Christian Tempelhofer Strasse 95 D-33100 Paderborn / DE | 04 /
SCHULZ, Wolfgang Brandisstrasse 33 D-33100 Paderborn / DE | 05 /
SCHOENFELDT, Kay Abtsbrede 38A D-30098 Paderborn / DE | [2000/10] |
Former [2000/05] | 01 /
BRANDT, Frank Geraer Strasse 10A D-12209 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
LUKANEK, Frank Brombeerweg 32 D-14052 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
HENSEN, Christian Tempelhofer Strasse 95 D-33100 Paderborn / DE | |||
04 /
SCHULZ, Wolfgang Brandisstrasse 33 D-33100 Paderborn / DE | |||
05 /
SCHOENFELDT, Kay Jahnplatz 6 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/05] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 97943757.1 | 09.09.1997 | [2000/05] | WO1997DE02040 | Priority number, date | DE1997114386 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19714386 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9844651 | Date: | 08.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976205 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976205 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/58, H04B3/54 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H04B3/58 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04B3/54 (EP,US);
H04B2203/5466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2002/41] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG IN NIEDERSPANNUNGSNETZEN | [2000/05] | English: | DATA TRANSFER METHOD AND SYSTEM IN LOW VOLTAGE NETWORKS | [2000/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT DE DONNEES DANS LES RESEAUX BASSE TENSION | [2000/05] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.12.2002 | GB | 04.12.2002 | IT | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 04.12.2002 | |
GB | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2293950 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,12,24 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0714193 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 7 - line 45 * * page 3, column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 4; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19504587 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 1 - line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0735700 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 7 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 26 ** page 3, column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 21; figures 2,3 * |