EP0927012 - MULTILAYERED WOUND DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFITHS, Bryan 1 Coedcae Tirphil New Tredegar Gwent NP2 6HH / GB | 02 /
JACQUES, Elizabeth 9 Cedar Grove Hoole Chester CH2 3LQ / GB | 03 /
BISHOP, Stephen, M. 7 Threos Close Connah's Quay Deeside Flintshire CH5 4GT / GB | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Mays, Julie, et al Barker Brettel, Patent Attorneys, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2001/22] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1999/27] | Mays, Julie Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Patent Department, Swakeleys House, Milton Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8NS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97943854.6 | 05.09.1997 | [1999/27] | WO1997EP04926 | Priority number, date | GB19960018564 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9618564 | [1999/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809589 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927012 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0927012 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
A61F13/023 (EP,US);
A61F13/0206 (EP,US);
A61F13/022 (EP,US);
A61F13/0223 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00221 (EP,US);
A61F2013/8408 (EP,US);
Y10S428/919 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249986 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2139 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2164 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2303 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/27] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGER WUNDVERBAND | [1999/27] | English: | MULTILAYERED WOUND DRESSING | [1999/27] | French: | PANSEMENT A MULTIPLES COUCHES | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0026572 (KINGSDOWN MEDICAL CONSULTANTS [GB]) [DA] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [YD]EP0099758 (UNIV STRATHCLYDE [GB]) [YD] 5,6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0353972 (KENDALL & CO [US]) [A] 1* column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 4 *; | [X]GB2228682 (ULTRA LAB LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9417227 (C V LAB LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 5 * claim - *; | [XY]GB2290031 (SETON HEALTHCARE GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,7 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 8 * * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 6; claim 13 * [Y] 5,6,8,9 | by applicant | GB931258 | EP0026572 | EP0043354 | EP0099758 | EP0269393 | EP0476756 | WO9312275 | WO9417227 |