EP0929908 - SENSOR WITH IONISING RADIATION GAS WITH HIGH COUNTING RATE FOR A RADIOACTIVE TRACER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOSPACE INSTRUMENTS 10, rue Mercoeur 75011 Paris / FR | [2001/09] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Charpak, Georges 2, rue de Poissy 75005 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charpak, Georges 2, rue de Poissy 75005 Paris / FR | [2001/09] |
Former [1999/29] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/09] | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/29] | Fréchède, Michel Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97943923.9 | 01.10.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997FR01736 | Priority number, date | FR19960012004 | 02.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612004 | [1999/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814981 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929908 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J47/02, H01J47/06 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H01J47/02 (EP);
H01J47/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1999/29] | Title | German: | GASGEFÜLLTER DETEKTOR MIT SEHR HOHER ZÄHLRATE FÜR IONISIERENDE STRAHLUNG | [1999/29] | English: | SENSOR WITH IONISING RADIATION GAS WITH HIGH COUNTING RATE FOR A RADIOACTIVE TRACER | [1999/29] | French: | DETECTEUR A GAZ DE RAYONNEMENTS IONISANTS A TRES GRAND TAUX DE COMPTAGE | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 07.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/24] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.1999 | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0545270 (BERTHOLD LAB PROF DR) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 6,7; | [Y]DE4429925 (ROENTDEK HANDELS GMBH ;LITEF GMBH (DE)) [Y] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [DA]EP0615274 (BIOSPACE INSTR) [DA] 1,3,6,14 * the whole document * |