EP0948638 - METHOD FOR PREPARING COMPOSITIONS FOR TRANSFERRING NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RORER S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUKHNIKACHVILI, Tsiala 4, allée des Charmes F-91700 Sainte Geneviève des Bois / FR | 02 /
VACUS, Jo[l 65, rue de l'Amiral Mouchez F-75013 Paris / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Becker, Philippe, et al Rhône-Poulenc Rorer S.A. Direction Brevets 20 avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Becker, Philippe, et al Rhône-Poulenc Rorer S.A., Direction Brevets, 20 avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97943929.6 | 03.10.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997FR01747 | Priority number, date | FR19960012259 | 08.10.1996 Original published format: FR 9612259 | [1999/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9815639 | Date: | 16.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948638 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/88, A61K9/127 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (KR);
A61K47/6907 (EP,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,US);
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
C12N15/88 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/41] | Extension states | SI | 08.04.1999 | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DEN NUKLEINSÄUREN-TRANSFER. | [1999/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING COMPOSITIONS FOR TRANSFERRING NUCLEIC ACIDS | [1999/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRANSFERT D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES | [1999/41] |
Former [1999/41] | HERSTELLUNGSMETHODE FÜR DAS EINGRINGEN VON NUKLEINSÄURE | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS63277618 ; | [Y]WO8905636 (LIPOSOME CO INC [US]) [Y] 1-11,16-20,25,26 * abstract * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 21 * * claims 1-9 *; | [A]US4873089 (SCOTTO ANTHONY W [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9518863 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11,16-20,25,26 * abstract * * page 6, line 19 - line 31 * * revendications *; | [AD]WO9617823 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al); | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 51, Database accession no. 88-366133, XP002033669 & JPS63277618 A 19881115 (NOEVIR KK) [Y] 1-11,25,26 * abstract * | [A] - CHUN-JUNG CHU ET AL, "PH-SENSITIVE LIPOSOMES", JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH, NEW YORK, US, (19940301), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 361 - 395, XP000450216 [A] 1-4,6,16-22 * page 364 - page 366 * | [A] - XIAOHUAI ZHOU ET AL, "IMPROVED ENCAPSULATION OF DNA IN PH-SENSITIVE LIPOSOMES FOR TRANSFECTION", JOURNAL OF LIPOSOME RESEARCH, NEW YORK US, (19920101), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 125 - 139, XP000246010 [A] 1,4-6,8,16-19 * abstract * * page 126 * * page 131 - page 135; figure 3 * | [AD] - BARTHEL F ET AL, "GENE TRANSFER OPTIMIZATION WITH LIPOSPERMINE-COATED DNA", DNA AND CELL BIOLOGY, (19930701), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 553 - 560, XP000600772 |