EP0929854 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEBUGGING AND TUNING A PROCESS CONTROL NETWORK HAVING DISTRIBUTED CONTROL FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 8000 Maryland Avenue Clayton Missouri 63105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 8000 Maryland Avenue Clayton Missouri 63105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSON, Brent, H. 1008 Fremont Street Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | 02 /
BURNS, Harry, A. 211 West Meadow Lane Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Larry, K. 211 East Southridge Road Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/29] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97944499.9 | 26.09.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997US17343 | Priority number, date | US19960726263 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: US 726263 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9814851 | Date: | 09.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929854 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929854 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
G05B19/4184 (EP);
G05B19/4185 (EP);
G05B2219/31113 (EP);
G05B2219/31119 (EP);
G05B2219/31121 (EP);
G05B2219/31211 (EP);
G05B2219/33273 (EP);
G05B2219/33326 (EP);
G05B2219/34427 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FEHLERSUCHE UND FEINABSTIMMUNG IN EINEM PROZESSSTEUERUNGSNETZWERK MIT VERTEILTEN STEUERFUNKTIONEN | [1999/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEBUGGING AND TUNING A PROCESS CONTROL NETWORK HAVING DISTRIBUTED CONTROL FUNCTIONS | [1999/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A DEVERMINER ET A REGLER UN RESEAU DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS INDUSTRIEL POSSEDANT DES FONCTIONS DE COMMANDE DISTRIBUEES | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0450116 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,14,20 * page 2, line 52 - page 5, line 56; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0562333 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-28 * page 3, line 53 - page 5, line 32; figures 1,2,4 * | [Y] - "ADVANCED SYSTEMS SIMPLIFY CONTROL", MACHINE DESIGN, (19960711), vol. 68, no. 12, page 118, 120, XP000629608 [Y] 1,14,20 * the whole document * | [A] - BLACK P, "COMBINING LAN TECHNOLOGY WITH SMART SENSORS TO PROVIDE PREDICTIVE MAINTENANCE, DIAGNOSTICS AND ALARM SYSTEMS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INDUSTRIAL COMPUTING CONFERENCE, CHICAGO, SEPT. 19 - 24, 1993, INDUSTRIAL COMPUTING SOCIETY / INSTRUMENT SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (19930919), vol. 3, pages 345 - 354, XP000448482 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |