blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968551

EP0968551 - LASER DIODE HAVING SMOOTH ENABLE APC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC.
120 San Gabriel Drive
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / LINK, Garry, N.
19295 S.W. Hennig Street
Aloha, OR 97006 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2007/01]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2005/22]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Modiano & Assiciati Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2004/49]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Modiano & Associati Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
Former [2002/03]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Via di Citille, 85
50022 Greve (FI) / IT
Former [2000/01]O'Byrne, Daniel Joseph
Via del Parione, 8
50123 Firenze / IT
Application number, filing date97944511.126.09.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US17385
Priority number, dateUS1996073188922.10.1996         Original published format: US 731889
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9818184
Date:30.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968551
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.04.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2006
ClassificationIPC:H01S3/00, H01S3/10, H01S3/13
[2000/01]
CPC:
H01S5/06825 (EP,US); H01S5/042 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:APC-SCHALTKREIS FÜR LASERDIODEM MIT GEGLÄTTERTEM EINSCHALTVERHALTEN[2000/01]
English:LASER DIODE HAVING SMOOTH ENABLE APC CIRCUIT[2000/01]
French:DIODE LASER A CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE VALIDATION CONTINUE DE COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE PUISSANCE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase17.05.1999National basic fee paid 
17.05.1999Search fee paid 
17.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
11.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/11]
26.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
02.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200206   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2003
30.09.200610   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2006
30.09.200711   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6365690  ;
 [A]JPH0414884  ;
 [A]US4872080  (HENTSCHEL CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-17,19-22 * abstract * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880805), vol. 012, no. 287, Database accession no. (E - 643), & JP63065690 A 19880324 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-17,19-22 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920423), vol. 016, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 1194), & JP04014884 A 19920120 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-17,19-22 * abstract * * figure 1 *
International search[A]USH322H  ;
 [A]US5473623  (FAHEY WILLIAM D [US], et al);
 [A]JPS60169182  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JPH03255684  (SONY CORP)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.