EP1023553 - AN ASSEMBLY OF AN END-FITTING AND A FLEXIBLE PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKT Flexibles I/S Priorparken 510 2605 Brondby / DK | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGKJAER, Krystyna, Izabella Skodsborgvej 340, 2. tv. DK-2850 Naerum / DK | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Holme, Edvard, et al Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Holme, Edvard, et al Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 97944745.5 | 14.10.1997 | [2000/31] | WO1997DK00451 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9919655 | Date: | 22.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1023553 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1023553 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/01 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
F16L33/01 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49984 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49986 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG ZWISCHEN FLEXIBLER ROHRLEITUNG UND ANSCHLUSSSTÜCK | [2001/13] | English: | AN ASSEMBLY OF AN END-FITTING AND A FLEXIBLE PIPE | [2000/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONSTITUE D'UN RACCORD D'EXTREMITE ET D'UN TUYAU SOUPLE | [2000/31] |
Former [2000/31] | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG ZWISCHEN FLEXIBLER ROHRLEITUNG UNS ANSCHLUSSSTÜCK | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2001 | BE | 19.12.2001 | CH | 19.12.2001 | FI | 19.12.2001 | GR | 19.12.2001 | IT | 19.12.2001 | LI | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | PT | 19.03.2002 | SE | 19.03.2002 | DE | 20.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
FI | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
DE | 20.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
FI | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
DE | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
FI | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
FI | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 19.12.2001 | |
FI | 19.12.2001 | ||
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
GR | 19.12.2001 | ||
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
PT | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 19.12.2001 | |
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1032987 (NEUE ARGUS GMBH); | [A]DE2357047 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [A]DE2366584 |