EP0932360 - BIOCIDE IMPREGNATED FIBRE REINFORCED SPONGE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalle Nalo GmbH & Co. KG Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANS, Leo An der Hasenquelle 8 D-55120 Mainz / DE | 02 /
HAMMER, Klaus-Dieter An der Hasenquelle 25 D-55120 Mainz / DE | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Zounek, Nikolai, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/29] | Zounek, Nikolai, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/31] | Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 97944841.2 | 06.09.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997EP04849 | Priority number, date | DE1996218058U | 18.10.1996 Original published format: DE 29618058 U | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817165 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932360 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932360 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/16, C08L1/06, C08J9/00 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C08L1/06 (EP,US);
A47L13/17 (EP,US);
B08B1/143 (EP);
C08K5/0058 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0287 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0058, C08L1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/31] | Title | German: | BIOCID AUSGERÜSTETES, FASERVERSTÄRKTES SCHWAMMTUCH | [1999/31] | English: | BIOCIDE IMPREGNATED FIBRE REINFORCED SPONGE MATERIAL | [1999/31] | French: | TISSU EPONGE RENFORCE PAR DES FIBRES, IMPREGNE DE BIOCIDE | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 02.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 12.09.2002 | [2004/22] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH02160843 ; | [X]JPH02153723 ; | [A]GB887430 (ALGEMENE KUNSTZIJDE UNIE NV); | [A]DE1297852 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]DE2841749 (EXTERMA GERM PROD); | [Y]DE2834914 (KENDALL & CO) [Y] 1-13 * page 7, line 2 - line 7 *; | [X]US5441742 (AUTANT PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-13 * siehe das ganze Dokument * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900912), vol. 14, no. 423, Database accession no. (C - 757), & JP02160843 A 19900620 (LION CORP) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 31, Database accession no. 234392 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900831), vol. 14, no. 404, Database accession no. (M - 1018), & JP02153723 A 19900613 (LION CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 30, Database accession no. 226787 [ ] * abstract * | Examination | US4940631 |