EP0932483 - AQUEOUS CONCRETE PARTING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/17] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states Cognis Deutschland GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALKOWSKI, Jürgen Akazienstrasse 25 D-40627 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
HECK, Stephan Aggerstrasse 9 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | 03 /
HÜBNER, Norbert Brockenstrasse 12 D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
WEGENER, Ingo Am Falder 133 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [1999/31] | Application number, filing date | 97944851.1 | 08.09.1997 | [1999/31] | WO1997EP04870 | Priority number, date | DE1996137841 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19637841 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812032 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0932483 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0932483 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/38, C10M173/02, // C10N40/36 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
B28B7/384 (EP,US);
C10M129/06 (EP,US);
C10M145/40 (EP,US);
C10M173/02 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
C10M2209/12 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
C10N2040/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/31] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BETONTRENNMITTEL | [1999/31] | English: | AQUEOUS CONCRETE PARTING AGENTS | [1999/31] | French: | AGENTS AQUEUX DE DEMOULAGE DU BETON | [1999/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 11.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.12.2003 | GB | 03.12.2003 | IT | 03.12.2003 | NL | 03.12.2003 | DK | 03.03.2004 | SE | 03.03.2004 | ES | 14.03.2004 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 03.12.2003 | |
GB | 03.12.2003 | ||
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | GB | 03.12.2003 | |
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
DK | 03.03.2004 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | GB | 03.12.2003 | |
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
ES | 14.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 03.12.2003 | |
NL | 03.12.2003 | ||
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 03.12.2003 | |
SE | 03.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 03.03.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4400272 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * page 3, line 15 - line 66 *; | [PY]DE19529907 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PY] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4033928 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,2,5; | [PA]DE19607977 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [PA] 1,2,5,8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8607003 (STALEY MFG CO A E [US]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 34 * |