EP1000210 - TRANSPORTABLE BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UTI Holding + Management AG Brossstrasse 9 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2001/15] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Uti Holding + Management AG Bockenheimer Landstrasse 70 60323 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜTZE, Günter, W. Hauptstrasse 65 D-16548 Glienicke / DE | [2000/20] | Application number, filing date | 97945870.0 | 24.10.1997 | [2000/20] | WO1997EP05878 | Priority number, date | DE1996144261 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644261 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9817882 | Date: | 30.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000210 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04H1/12, E04B1/343 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
A01K1/0035 (EP);
B28B23/0087 (EP);
B28B7/22 (EP);
B64D1/22 (EP);
E04B1/34336 (EP);
E04B1/3442 (EP);
E04H1/02 (EP);
F24S20/67 (EP);
E04B2001/3588 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | TRANSPORTFÄHIGES GEBÄUDE | [2000/20] | English: | TRANSPORTABLE BUILDING | [2000/20] | French: | BATIMENT TRANSPORTABLE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 12.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | 11.08.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   12.08.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2001 | 31.10.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DD17457U (NOEL ET AL.) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1602672 (MOISAN); | [A]DE2208942 (MUELLER EBERHARD) [A] 1,7,8,18,20,25,28 * the whole document *; | [A]DE7734318U (FA. KARL GRAEFF) [A] 1,7,14,16,17 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2465848 (MOURNAUD PATRICK [FR]) [A] 1,10-13,31 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2062059 (MIDTFJORD IND AS) [A] 1,10-12,14,30 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0032311 (PENDAR TECH ASS LTD [GB]); | [A]DE3134022 (MALERWERKSTAETTEN HEINRICH SCH [DE]); | [A]DE8523721U (BISCHOFF) [A] 1,14,21,22,28 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0282425 (PHENOL ENG [FR]); | [A]DE3734736 (ROSSA HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1,7,25,26 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4337780 (HAAS REINHOLD [DE], et al) [A] 1,7 * figure 1 * |