EP0944597 - METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH BIOTECH PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED Watlington Road Cowley Oxford, OX4 5LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states BRITISH BIOTECH PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED Watlington Road Cowley Oxford, OX4 5LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLOYD, Christopher, David British Biotech Phar. Ltd., Watlington Road Cowley, Oxford OX4 5LY / GB | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Walls, Alan James, et al British Biotech Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Watlington Road Oxford OX4 5LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Walls, Alan James, et al British Biotech Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Watlington Road Oxford OX4 5LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97945960.9 | 27.11.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997GB03258 | Priority number, date | GB19960024817 | 28.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9624817 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823588 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944597 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/48, C07D401/12, C07K5/06, A61K31/40, A61K38/00 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
C07K5/06078 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K5/0606 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | METALLOPROTEINASE-HEMMER | [1999/39] | English: | METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITORS | [1999/39] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE METALLOPROTEINASES | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 02.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/47] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO9703783 (BRITISH BIOTECH PHARM [GB], et al) [PX] 1,21 * examples 21,22; claims 1,20 *; | [DX]WO9611209 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB]) [DX] 1,21 * claims 1,17 *; | [X]WO9635712 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,21 * claims 1,20 *; | [PX]WO9738007 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB]) [PX] 1,21 * claims 1,5 *; | [AD]WO9513289 (CHIROSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,21 * claims 1,4 *; | [AD] - R. D. GRAY ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1981), vol. 101, no. 4, pages 1251 - 8, XP002058265 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(81)91582-5 | [AD] - K. T. CHAPMAN ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 36, pages 4293 - 4301, XP002058266 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00078a019 |