19.09.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
27.09.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
19.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
29.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.09.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] |
02.02.2001 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
15.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.01.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.11.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.06.2000 |
First examination report |
|
21.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.10.1999 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] |
22.10.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] |
17.09.1999 |
Change - priority |
published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] |
06.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
06.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |
08.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.12.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|