Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9912348 | Global Dossier | 11.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9825413 | Global Dossier | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9732437 | Global Dossier | 04.09.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9713364 | Global Dossier | 10.04.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8824873 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2014 | B2 | US2013188935 | 25.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | US201313848256 | 21.03.2013 | US201213364779 | 02.02.2012 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8428425 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2013 | B2 | US2012189278 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | US201213364779 | 02.02.2012 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8311387 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2012 | B2 | US2012189277 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | US201213364767 | 02.02.2012 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8270802 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2012 | B2 | US2012189276 | 26.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | US201213364633 | 02.02.2012 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8654861 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2014 | B2 | US2011279642 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68370110 | 07.01.2010 | US201113080858 | 06.04.2011 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391690 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2011236001 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | US201113078342 | 01.04.2011 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391691 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2011234752 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US201113078352 | 01.04.2011 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391689 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2011234751 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US201113078314 | 01.04.2011 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011181700 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68370110 | 07.01.2010 | US201113080811 | 06.04.2011 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011181699 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | US201113080784 | 06.04.2011 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68370110 | 07.01.2010 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011181698 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113080760 | 06.04.2011 | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68370110 | 07.01.2010 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011181697 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | US201113080750 | 06.04.2011 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68370110 | 07.01.2010 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391693 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2011181696 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US201113078390 | 01.04.2011 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391692 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2011181695 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | US201113078378 | 01.04.2011 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8139929 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B2 | US2011080468 | 07.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US95023310 | 19.11.2010 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8441519 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2013 | B2 | US2010119213 | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68367710 | 07.01.2010 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8442112 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2013 | B2 | US2010111503 | 06.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US68370110 | 07.01.2010 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8150240 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2012 | B2 | US2010020158 | 28.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | US57813409 | 13.10.2009 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8107794 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2012 | B2 | US2009252483 | 08.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | US46497709 | 13.05.2009 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8160420 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2012 | B2 | US2009220215 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | US46498609 | 13.05.2009 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8184961 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2012 | B2 | US2008292287 | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US93165507 | 31.10.2007 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8200064 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2012 | B2 | US2008101767 | 01.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93174007 | 31.10.2007 | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8467456 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2013 | B2 | US2008063386 | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US92853007 | 30.10.2007 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8467455 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2013 | B2 | US2008063385 | 13.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92824607 | 30.10.2007 | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8391686 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2008056686 | 06.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US93185907 | 31.10.2007 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8155500 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2005180735 | 18.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | US10211805 | 08.04.2005 | US48653800 | 05.06.2000 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7194194 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2007 | B2 | US2004179820 | 16.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93298301 | 21.08.2001 | US33588503 | 03.01.2003 | US80085804 | 16.03.2004 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6954584 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2005 | B2 | US2004175133 | 09.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93298301 | 21.08.2001 | US33588503 | 03.01.2003 | US80083304 | 16.03.2004 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6907190 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2005 | B2 | US2003138238 | 24.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93298301 | 21.08.2001 | US33588503 | 03.01.2003 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7317868 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2008 | B2 | US2003108341 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | US31947699 | 04.06.1999 | US34282603 | 15.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100321020B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2002 | B1 | KR20010023520 | 26.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4041198B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2008 | B2 | JPH11191895 | 13.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3935507B | Global Dossier | 27.06.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3920922B | Global Dossier | 30.05.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3916025B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2007 | B2 | JPH11150706 | 02.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP24420198 | 28.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015029161 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177203 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5555796B | Global Dossier | 23.07.2014 | B2 | JP2013211901 | 10.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2013113010 | 29.05.2013 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5314797B | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B2 | JP2013069403 | 18.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2012250068 | 14.11.2012 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5172030B | Global Dossier | 27.03.2013 | B2 | JP2012199976 | 18.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | JP2012119948 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012199972 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2012 | A | JP5042394B | 03.10.2012 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2012118641 | 24.05.2012 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5163826B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B2 | JP2012178870 | 13.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2012115296 | 21.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5042393B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2012 | B2 | JP2012138954 | 19.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2012081591 | 30.03.2012 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011199879 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2011 | A | JP4768890B | 07.09.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | JP2011102484 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5027938B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B2 | JP2011182412 | 15.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2011063412 | 22.03.2011 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011182411 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2011 | A | JP4759098B | 31.08.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2011063411 | 22.03.2011 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011182410 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2011 | A | JP4744648B | 10.08.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2011063410 | 22.03.2011 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011172249 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2011 | A | JP4744647B | 10.08.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011063409 | 22.03.2011 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4798314B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | B2 | JP2011172248 | 01.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011061947 | 22.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4798313B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | B2 | JP2011172247 | 01.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011061946 | 22.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4768892B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B2 | JP2011166828 | 25.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011102486 | 28.04.2011 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4768891B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B2 | JP2011166827 | 25.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011102485 | 28.04.2011 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4766201B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B2 | JP2011160445 | 18.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011052657 | 10.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4771013B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | B2 | JP2011147133 | 28.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2011011648 | 24.01.2011 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5041082B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2012 | B2 | JP2011142674 | 21.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011061948 | 22.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4771012B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | B2 | JP2011120263 | 16.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011011647 | 24.01.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4784706B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2011 | B2 | JP2011101437 | 19.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011026824 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4766199B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B2 | JP2011101436 | 19.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2011026823 | 10.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011019250 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177205 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4706801B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2011015420 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177211 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011015419 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2010177210 | 06.08.2010 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4706800B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2011015418 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177209 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4706798B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2011015417 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177206 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4706797B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2011015416 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177204 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4706796B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2011015415 | 20.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177202 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011010302 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A | JP4605312B | 05.01.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP2010143469 | 24.06.2010 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011010301 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2011 | A | JP4605311B | 05.01.2011 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010143468 | 24.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4605313B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2011 | B2 | JP2010283840 | 16.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010143470 | 24.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010268516 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177208 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4706799B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2010268515 | 25.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010177207 | 06.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4618393B | Global Dossier | 26.01.2011 | B2 | JP2010233257 | 14.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP2010155631 | 08.07.2010 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4770994B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | B2 | JP2010193481 | 02.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010069657 | 25.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4770992B | Global Dossier | 14.09.2011 | B2 | JP2010183607 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP2010059078 | 16.03.2010 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4767351B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2011 | B2 | JP2010183600 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2010055178 | 11.03.2010 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4717952B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2011 | B2 | JP2010183599 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2010055177 | 11.03.2010 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4717951B | Global Dossier | 06.07.2011 | B2 | JP2010183598 | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2010055176 | 11.03.2010 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4489839B | Global Dossier | 23.06.2010 | B2 | JP2010022067 | 28.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009247085 | 27.10.2009 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4561927B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2010 | B2 | JP2010020898 | 28.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2009246175 | 27.10.2009 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009247032 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | JP2009178447 | 30.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4488111B | Global Dossier | 23.06.2010 | B2 | JP2009239978 | 15.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009170948 | 22.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4488108B | Global Dossier | 23.06.2010 | B2 | JP2009219165 | 24.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009156692 | 01.07.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4358903B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009183006 | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009122604 | 20.05.2009 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4358902B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009183005 | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009122603 | 20.05.2009 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4358901B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009183004 | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009122602 | 20.05.2009 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4372834B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009177851 | 06.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP2009115443 | 12.05.2009 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4351734B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | B2 | JP2009171615 | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2009110168 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4351733B | Global Dossier | 28.10.2009 | B2 | JP2009171614 | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2009110167 | 28.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4368939B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009153212 | 09.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009091095 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4368938B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009153211 | 09.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP2009091094 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4368937B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B2 | JP2009153210 | 09.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2009091093 | 03.04.2009 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4321658B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2009 | B2 | JP2008236757 | 02.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP2008077343 | 25.03.2008 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4381440B | Global Dossier | 09.12.2009 | B2 | JP2008079316 | 03.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4124268B | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | B2 | JP2008067393 | 21.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4069957B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2008 | B2 | JP2008048430 | 28.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4036239B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2008 | B2 | JP2007166651 | 28.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4331759B | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | B2 | JP2007166647 | 28.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP2007001788 | 09.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003101966 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2003 | A | JP3361515B | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003101965 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2003 | A | JP3361514B | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003101964 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2003 | A | JP3361513B | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003101963 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2003 | A | JP3361512B | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003101955 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2003 | A | JP3361516B | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003022661 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2003 | A | JP3361511B | 07.01.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3769507B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2006 | B2 | JP2002298509 | 11.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2299702 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2299702 | 27.04.2011 | A3 | EP2299702 | 23.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | EP09164213 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2271090 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2271090 | 27.04.2011 | A3 | EP2271090 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | EP09164213 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2268015 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B1 | EP2268015 | 13.04.2011 | A3 | EP2268015 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | EP10151837 | 03.12.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2259588 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2259588 | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP2259588 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | EP09164213 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2259587 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2259587 | 27.04.2011 | A3 | EP2259587 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | EP09164213 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2259586 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2259586 | 27.04.2011 | A3 | EP2259586 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | EP09164213 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2259585 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B1 | EP2259585 | 13.04.2011 | A3 | EP2259585 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | EP10151837 | 03.12.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2259584 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2013 | B1 | EP2259584 | 13.04.2011 | A3 | EP2259584 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | EP10151837 | 03.12.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2180717 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2012 | B1 | EP2180717 | 05.05.2010 | A3 | EP2180717 | 28.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2175666 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2012 | B1 | EP2175666 | 05.05.2010 | A3 | EP2175666 | 14.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2175665 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2012 | B1 | EP2175665 | 05.05.2010 | A3 | EP2175665 | 14.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2175659 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2012 | B1 | EP2175659 | 05.05.2010 | A3 | EP2175659 | 14.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP01101177 | 03.12.1997 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2160027 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | A3 | EP2160027 | 03.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | EP99104107 | 27.09.1996 | EP96932019 | 27.09.1996 | EP04008669 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2101496 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2013 | B1 | EP2101496 | 04.11.2009 | A3 | EP2101496 | 16.09.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2101495 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2012 | B1 | EP2101495 | 04.11.2009 | A3 | EP2101495 | 16.09.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2101494 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2013 | B1 | EP2101494 | 04.11.2009 | A3 | EP2101494 | 16.09.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | EP06011611 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1708487 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2013 | B1 | EP1708487 | 18.08.2010 | A3 | EP1708487 | 04.10.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | EP98940632 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1693844 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2006 | A3 | EP1693844 | 23.08.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | EP97903634 | 28.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1435736 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2010 | B1 | EP1435736 | 18.01.2006 | A3 | EP1435736 | 07.07.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | EP99104107 | 27.09.1996 | EP96932019 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1094674 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B1 | EP1094674 | 30.04.2008 | A3 | EP1094674 | 25.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | EP97946090 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1011268 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2010 | B1 | EP1011268 | 27.12.2000 | A4 | EP1011268 | 21.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0920203 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | B8 | EP0920203 | 01.09.2004 | B1 | EP0920203 | 09.06.1999 | A3 | EP0920203 | 02.06.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | EP96932019 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0888018 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2006 | B1 | EP0888018 | 09.06.1999 | A4 | EP0888018 | 30.12.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0847197 | Global Dossier | 06.05.1999 | B1 | EP0847197 | 10.06.1998 | A4 | EP0847197 | 10.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0944269 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2002 | B1 | EP0944269 | 08.12.1999 | A4 | EP0944269 | 22.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2273891 | 12.06.2001 | C | CA2273891 | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2340314 | 08.07.2003 | C | CA2340314 | 11.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | CA2273891 | 03.12.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100484228C | 29.04.2009 | C | CN1624788 | 08.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100492517C | 27.05.2009 | C | CN1591656 | 09.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100551013C | 14.10.2009 | C | CN1968388 | 23.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1164103C | 25.08.2004 | C | CN1197574 | 28.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1183780C | 05.01.2005 | C | CN1247004 | 08.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1286327C | 22.11.2006 | C | CN1212812 | 31.03.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1223187C | 12.10.2005 | C | CN1269941 | 11.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1750628B | 25.05.2011 | B | CN1750628 | 22.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1866378B | 29.09.2010 | B | CN1866378 | 22.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1917066B | 06.10.2010 | B | CN1917066 | 21.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69602372T | 20.01.2000 | T2 | DE69602372D1 | 10.06.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69633300T | 01.09.2005 | T2 | DE69633300D1 | 07.10.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69638111D1 | 25.02.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69717139T | 02.10.2003 | T2 | DE69717139D1 | 19.12.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69736062T | 11.01.2007 | T2 | DE69736062D1 | 20.07.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69841532D1 | 15.04.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1011907 | 23.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1016796 | 05.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1151153 | 20.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1151155 | 20.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1151913 | 10.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1152814 | 09.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100348922B | 18.11.2002 | B1 | KR19990087305 | 27.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100354418B | 28.09.2002 | B1 | KR20000057426 | 15.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100379786B | 25.08.2003 | B1 | KR19990063899 | 26.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9801216 | 30.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY110657 | 30.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG149665 | 27.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | JP9602804 | 27.09.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG168417 | 28.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW436777B | 28.05.2001 | B | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6484266 | 19.11.2002 | B2 | US2001053281 | 20.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | US93295301 | 21.08.2001 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6502199 | 31.12.2002 | B2 | US2001055474 | 27.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | US93317901 | 21.08.2001 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6526226 | 25.02.2003 | B2 | US2002001454 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93307901 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6502200 | 31.12.2002 | B2 | US2002001455 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93318001 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6546195 | 08.04.2003 | B2 | US2002003944 | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93298301 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6516139 | 04.02.2003 | B2 | US2002003945 | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93301401 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6516138 | 04.02.2003 | B2 | US2002003950 | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93300301 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6519414 | 11.02.2003 | B2 | US2002003951 | 10.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93300601 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6502198 | 31.12.2002 | B2 | US2002025143 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US93296901 | 21.08.2001 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7747145 | 29.06.2010 | B2 | US2003053797 | 20.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | US28472702 | 31.10.2002 | US12588598 | 27.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5923869 | 13.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6393574 | 21.05.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6470460 | 22.10.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP27671095 | 29.09.1995 | US72173696 | 27.09.1996 | US93299901 | 21.08.2001 | US19599898 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6573819 | 03.06.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP9704429 | 03.12.1997 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | JP28809997 | 21.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6574423 | 03.06.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP4158396 | 28.02.1996 | JP9700615 | 28.02.1997 | JP32377096 | 04.12.1996 | JP34728496 | 26.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6925250 | 02.08.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP23432097 | 29.08.1997 | JP33454397 | 04.12.1997 | JP9803873 | 31.08.1998 | Type | Divisional application | EP1094674 | EP2175665 | EP2175666 | EP2175659 | EP2180717 | EP2259584 | EP2268015 | EP2259585 |