EP1001816 - PERFLUORINATED-ETHER COMPOSITIONS AS DIAGNOSTIC CONTRAST AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMARX PHARMACEUTICAL CORP. 1635 East 18th Street Tucson, AZ 85719 / US | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNGER, evan, C. 13365 E. Camino LaCebadilla Tucson, AZ 85749 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97946447.6 | 03.11.1997 | [2000/21] | WO1997US19900 | Priority number, date | US19960031903P | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 31903 P | US19970800993 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: US 800993 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823298 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001816 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/04, C07C41/00, C07C19/08, A61K47/48 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
A61K49/223 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | A61K49/04, C07C41/00, C07C19/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] | Title | German: | PERFLUORIETE ETHERN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN WIE KONTRASTMITTEL | [2000/21] | English: | PERFLUORINATED-ETHER COMPOSITIONS AS DIAGNOSTIC CONTRAST AGENTS | [2000/21] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ETHER PERFLUORE UTILISEES COMME AGENTS DE CONTRASTE DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 18.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 21.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9631196 (IMARX PHARMACEUTICAL CORP) [X] 1-17,24-62,64,66-69 * page 23, line 20 - page 24, line 8; claims 3-8,17,18,35,36,46 *; | [X]WO9531965 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [X] 1-17,24-62,64,66-69 * abstract * * page 8 - page 11 * * page 14, lines 1-5; claims 16,22,30; table 1 *; | [PX]WO9640281 (WEERS JEFFRY GREG ;ALLIANCE PHARMA (US); KABALNOV ALEXEY (US); SCH) [PX] 1-17,24-62,64,66-69 * abstract *; | [E]WO9842384 (IMARX PHARMACEUTICAL CORP) [E] 1-17,24-62,64,66-69 * page 56, lines 12-15; examples 2,5,9; claims 2,3,11,18-25,35,52-54,61-64 *; | [A]US5350571 (KAUFMAN ROBERT J ET AL) [A] 1-17,24-62,64,66-69 * abstract * * column 6, lines 31-49 *; | [E]WO9804292 (ACUSPHERE INC) [E] 1-17,24-62,64,66-69 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5498421 ; | [Y]US5501863 ; | [Y]US5350571 ; | [Y]US5502094 |