EP0938722 - DETECTION SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED NOISE TOLERANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auto-Sense, Ltd 10488 West 6th Avenue Lakewood, CO 80228 / US | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUDS, Scott 11536 Riviera Place, N.E. Seattle, WA 98125 / US | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [2006/04] |
Former [1999/35] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 97946652.1 | 13.11.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997US20637 | Priority number, date | US19960030991P | 14.11.1996 Original published format: US 30991 P | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821704 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938722 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0938722 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, G08G1/16, G01S7/483, G08B13/181, G01S7/497 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B60Q9/008 (EP);
G01S17/00 (KR);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/4873 (EP);
G01S17/87 (EP);
G01S2007/4975 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/35] | G08G1/16, G01S13/93, G01S7/295 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/35] | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSSYSTEM MIT ERHÖHTER RAUSCHTOLERANZ | [1999/35] | English: | DETECTION SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED NOISE TOLERANCE | [1999/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE DETECTION PRESENTANT UNE TOLERANCE AU BRUIT AMELIOREE | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 08.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6089784 ; | [A]US4825211 (PARK BYUNG-YOUNG [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 6 - line 13 *; | [A]US5463384 (JUDS SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 14 - column 8, line 58; figures 2,7,10A,; claims 1,14 * * column 17, line 37 - line 52 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850921), vol. 009, no. 236, Database accession no. (P - 390), & JP60089784 A 19850520 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6089784 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]US5354983 (JUDS SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]US5432509 (KAJIWARA YASUYA [JP]) | by applicant | US3999083 | US4142116 | US4356393 | US4851660 | US4851661 | US4990895 | US4992675 | US5122796 | US5337251 | US5463384 |