EP0942746 - INHIBITION OF INVASIVE REMODELLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDEN TIL FREMME AF EKSPERIMENTEL CANCERFORSKNING c/o Advokat Michael Rostock Vester Voldgade 90 DK-1552 Copenhagen V / DK | [2005/11] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states FONDEN TIL FREMME AF EKSPERIMENTAL CANCERFORSKNING c/o Advokat Michael Rostock Vester Voldgade 90 DK-1552 Copenhagen V / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND, Leif Roege Vognmandsmarken 17, 1.th DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | 02 /
DANOE, Keld L. E. Bruunsvej 20 DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 03 /
STEPHENS, Ross Broholms Allé 36, 2.th. DK-2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 04 /
BRÜNNER, Nils Brodersens Allé 1 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | 05 /
SOLBERG, Helene Solbakken 4 DK-3400 Hilleroed / DK | 06 /
HOLST-HANSEN, Claus Hostrupsvej 5, 1. tv. DK-1950 Frederiksberg C / DK | 07 /
NIELSEN, John Roemer Cal Johansgade 11, 1. tv. DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 97946746.1 | 08.12.1997 | [1999/38] | WO1997DK00555 | Priority number, date | DK19960001402 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: DK 140296 | [1999/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824474 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942746 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942746 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/57, A61K45/06, G01N33/50, // (A61K38/57, 31:195),(A61K38/57, 31:195, 31:40),(A61K38/57, 31:195, 31:38, A61P35:00, 19:02) | [2003/38] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K38/57 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/40, A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K38/57, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/57, A61K31/40 (EP) |
Former IPC [1999/38] | A61K38/57, A61K45/06, G01N33/50, // (A61K38/57, 31:195),(A61K38/57, 31:195, 31:40),(A61K38/57, 31:195, 31:38) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/38] | Title | German: | INHIBIERUNG VON INVASIVER REMODULIERUNG | [2003/38] | English: | INHIBITION OF INVASIVE REMODELLING | [1999/38] | French: | INHIBITION DU REMODELAGE INVASIF | [1999/38] |
Former [1999/38] | INHIBIERUNG VON INVASIVER HERMODULIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2005 | BE | 16.03.2005 | CH | 16.03.2005 | FI | 16.03.2005 | FR | 16.03.2005 | LI | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | DK | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | IE | 08.12.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/08] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
SE | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
IE | 08.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
CH | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
DK | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 16.03.2005 | |
BE | 16.03.2005 | ||
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0238993 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] * claim 15 *; | [A]WO9220361 (KNOLL AG [DE]) [A] * page 2, line 6 - line 9 * * page 3, line 4 - line 13 *; | [X]WO9524921 (INST OF OPHTHALMOLOGY [GB], et al) [X] 1-19,26,29,30,33-35,37-47,51,59,60 * page 1, line 2 - line 5 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 1 * * page 12, line 7 - line 17 * * page 15, line 5 - page 16, line 9 * * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 28 *; | [X] - SCHULTZ ET AL, "TREATMENT OF ALKALI-INJURED RABBIT CORNEAS WITH A SYNTHETIC INHIBITOR OF MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE, (199211), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 3325 - 3331, XP000676618 [X] 1-19,29,30,33-35,37-47,59,60 * page 3325, abstract; page 3329-3331, 'Discussion' * | [DA] - BUGGE ET AL, "PLASMINOGEN DEFICIENCY CAUSES SEVERE THROMBOSIS BUT IS COMPATIBLE WITH DEVELOPMENT AND REPRODUCTION", GENES DEV., (1995), vol. 9, pages 794 - 807, XP002063450 [DA] 61-63 * the whole document * | [A] - KHOKHA ET AL, "UTILIZATION OF TRANSGENIC MICE IN THE STUDY OF MATRIX DEGRADING PROTEINASES AND THEIR INHIBITORS", CANCER AND METASTASIS REVIEWS, (1995), vol. 14, pages 97 - 111, XP002063451 [A] 61-63 * page 97 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00665794 | [PX] - STONELAKE ET AL, "PROTEINASE INHIBITORS REDUCE BASMENT MEMBRANE DEGRADATION BY HUMAN BREAST CANCER CELL LINES", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (199704), vol. 75, no. 7, pages 951 - 959, XP002063452 [PX] 1-23,29,30,33-35,37-45,47,48,54,59,60 * page 951 * * abstract * |