EP0945038 - CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS IN BORDER AREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTTINEN, Ari Ristiniementie 4 D 30 FIN-02320 Espoo / FI | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael, et al Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97946778.4 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997FI00757 | Priority number, date | FI19960004855 | 04.12.1996 Original published format: FI 964855 | [1999/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9825427 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945038 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, // H04Q7/30 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
H04W16/00 (EP,US);
H04W16/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/39] | Title | German: | ZELLULARES FUNKSYSTEM MIT VERBESSERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN IN GRENZBEREICHEN | [1999/39] | English: | CELLULAR RADIO SYSTEM WITH IMPROVED CHARACTERISTICS IN BORDER AREAS | [1999/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRE A CARACTERISTIQUES AMELIOREES DANS LES ZONES FRONTALIERES | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2005 | 22.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/23] | 03.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0566551 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [X]US5428817 (YAHAGI MASAHIKO [JP]); | [X]WO9608119 (TELIA AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO9638014 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |