blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0942945

EP0942945 - FOAMED HIGH DENSITY POLYETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.04.2006  [2006/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VA 22037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, VI 22037-0001 / US
Former [1999/38]For all designated states
MOBIL OIL CORPORATION
3225 Gallows Road
Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COOPER, Kathleen, Kim
39 Louis Street
South River, NJ 08882 / US
02 / FIRDAUS, Vaseem
269 Bennetts Lane
Somerset, NJ 08873 / US
03 / POLOSO, Anthony
1078 Randolph Drive
Yardley, PA 19067 / US
04 / TONG, Paul, Po-Luck
91 Tuttle Road
Watchung, NJ 07060 / US
[1999/38]
Representative(s)Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1999/38]Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date97946951.718.11.1997
[1999/38]
WO1997US21223
Priority number, dateUS1996076176705.12.1996         Original published format: US 761767
[1999/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9824836
Date:11.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0942945
Date:22.09.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:C08J9/00, C08J9/36, C08J9/06, // C08L23/06
[2000/09]
CPC:
C08J9/06 (EP,US); C08J9/00 (KR); C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/38]C08J9/00, C08J9/36
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/38]
TitleGerman:EXPANDIERTES POLYETHYLEN MIT HOHER DICHTUNG[1999/38]
English:FOAMED HIGH DENSITY POLYETHYLENE[1999/38]
French:POLYETHYLENE EXPANSE DE HAUTE DENSITE[1999/38]
Entry into regional phase28.06.1999National basic fee paid 
28.06.1999Search fee paid 
28.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/38]
01.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/17]
22.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200509   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9634734  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 8 * * example 1 * * claim - *
International search[X]US4510031  (MATSUMURA MICHIO [JP], et al);
 [X]US5574074  (ZUSHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.