EP0971662 - FATTY ACID ESTERS OF GLYCOLIC ACID AND ITS SALTS AS PERMEATION ENHANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERATECH, INC. Suite 100, 417 Wakara Way Salt Lake City Utah 84108 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states TheraTech, Inc. Suite 100, 417 Wakara Way Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATESHWARAN, Srinivasan 2411 Emerson Avenue Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | 02 /
FIKSTAD, David 54 So. Elizabeth 4 Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Sonal, R. 2097 E. Candlespruce Cove Sandy, UT 84092 / US | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 97947295.8 | 29.10.1997 | [2000/03] | WO1997US19600 | Priority number, date | US19960741071 | 30.10.1996 Original published format: US 741071 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9818416 | Date: | 07.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971662 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61F13/02 (KR);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | FETTSÄUREESTER VON GLYCOLSÄURE UND DEREN SALZE ALS PENETRATIONSVERSTÄRKER | [2000/03] | English: | FATTY ACID ESTERS OF GLYCOLIC ACID AND ITS SALTS AS PERMEATION ENHANCERS | [2000/03] | French: | ESTERS D'ACIDE GRAS D'ACIDE GLYCOLIQUE ET SES SELS, UTILISES COMME RENFORCATEURS DE PENETRATION | [2000/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 02.05.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5314694 (GALE ROBERT M [US], et al) |