EP1051686 - COMPUTER BASED SYSTEM FOR IMAGING AND ANALYSING AN ENGINEERING OBJECT SYSTEM AND INDICATING VALUES OF SPECIFIC DESIGN CHANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTION MACHINE CORPORATION 200 Portland Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVOINO, Igor G. 75/1 Masherova Street 403 Minsk, 220020 / BY | 02 /
KOSHEVOY, Oleg E. 46 Sedikh Street 23 Minsk, 220103 / BY | 03 /
LITVIN, Simon S. Appartment 81, 38 Malodetskoselsky Avenue St.Petersburg 198147 / RU | 04 /
TSOURIKOV, Valery 770 Boylston Street Boston, MA 02199 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Rutetzki, Andreas, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Kampfenkel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 97947609.0 | 12.11.1997 | [2000/46] | WO1997US21325 | Priority number, date | US19960747922 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: US 747922 | US19970822314 | 21.03.1997 Original published format: US 822314 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9824016 | Date: | 04.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1051686 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
G06F30/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/46] | Title | German: | COMPUTERBASIERTES SYSTEM ZUM DARSTELLEN UND ANALYSIEREN EINES TECHNISCHEN OBJEKTSYSTEMS UND WERT VON SPEZIFISCHEN DESSINÄNDERUNGEN ANZEIGEND | [2000/46] | English: | COMPUTER BASED SYSTEM FOR IMAGING AND ANALYSING AN ENGINEERING OBJECT SYSTEM AND INDICATING VALUES OF SPECIFIC DESIGN CHANGES | [2000/46] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATISE POUR VISUALISER ET ANALYSER UN SYSTEME OBJET D'INGENIERIE ET INDIQUER DES VALEURS POUR LES MODIFICATIONS SPECIFIQUES DE LA CONCEPTION | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.06.1999 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2013 | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/13] | 18.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 19.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2000 | 30.11.2004 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2005 | 30.11.2013 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9622575 (INTERTECH VENTURES LTD [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,10,12,15 * page 3, line 56 - page 6 *; | [A]WO9632684 (MEDICAL SCIENCE SYS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7,10,12,15 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 7 * * page 9, line 24 - page 13, line 25 * * page 17, line 7 - page 18, line 19 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5359523 (TALBOTT MARVIN T [US], et al) [A] 3,11 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 2; figure 12 * | [A] - SUSHKOV V V ET AL, "Introduction to TIPS: a theory for creative design", ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE IN ENGINEERING UK, (1995), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0954-1810, pages 177 - 189, XP002337698 [A] 1,3,7,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0006] - [06.3] * * figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0954-1810(95)00002-Z | [A] - TSOURIKOV V, "Finding the systematic approach to new product development", WESCON/96 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.96CH35927) IEEE NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19961022), ISBN 0-7803-3274-1, pages 18 - 20, XP002337699 [A] 1,3,7,10,11,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WESCON.1996.553958 | International search | [XP]US5623418 (ROSTOKER MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [Y]US5546321 (CHANG CHI S [US], et al); | [A]US5111413 (LAZANSKY RICHARD W [US], et al); | [A]US5034899 (SCHULT UWE [CH]); | [A]US5084824 (LAM NIM C [US], et al) |