Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0882939
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.05.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
23.05.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
12.04.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.12.1999 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |
23.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
23.10.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
13.10.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.08.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|